+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 169 (effective - see bill)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB174ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 18101253D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB174E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On December 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101253D
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor