+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 515 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1736ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Delegates: Simon, Bell, Robert B., Collins
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators: Ebbin, Stuart, Stanley
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106889D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1736H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106889D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1736E
- Printed as engrossed 19104201D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 19104201D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
February 23, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2019: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2019: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
February 21, 2019: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor