+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 671 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 13, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB173ER)
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB173S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 044051820-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 044051820-S1
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 043998820
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2004: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2004: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor