+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 699 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB173ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (92-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 984488657-E
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Finance
On January 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 984488657
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 20, 1998: Reported from Local Government w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor