+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 6 (effective 7/1/96)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB172ER)
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 965400713-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 965400713-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp.(39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 965400713-S1
- Reported from P. & E. with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 963124801
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1996: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1996: Reported from P. & E. with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor