+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (11-Y 11-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB172S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105825D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18105825D-S1
- Incorporates SB553 (Dunnavant)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On December 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101120D