+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Floor substitute printed 19106470D-S1 (Dunnavant)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Dunnavant agreed to 19106470D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1717S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 19102425D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 5, 2019: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor