+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0915)
On April 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 915 (effective 7/1/97)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: REJECTED GOV'S RECOMM. (18-Y 21-N)
- Senate rejected Gov's recommendation (18-Y 21-N)
- Reading of Governor's communication waived
On March 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Governor's substitute printed 977575801-S2
On March 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB171ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 977567713-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 977567713-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 977567713-H1
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 4-N)
On January 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 977465713-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee amendments rejected
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
On January 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On November 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 977465713-S1
- Introduced bill reprinted 962098801
On October 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with substitute (9-Y 4-N)
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1997 in P. & E. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Privileges and Elections
- Motion for recommittal to committee agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (40-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendments (11-Y 1-N 1-A)
On January 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 962098801
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: REJECTED GOV'S RECOMM. (18-Y 21-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1997: Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 10, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 4-N)
January 9, 1997: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
October 23, 1996: Reported from P. & E. with substitute (9-Y 4-N)
February 13, 1996: Continued to 1997 in P. & E. (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1996: Reported from P. & E. with amendments (11-Y 1-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor