+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 814 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1709ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (97-Y 1-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 3-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (18-Y 1-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 19105897D-S1
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106262D-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1709S2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19106262D-S2
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 19105897D-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented and ordered printed 19104621D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
February 13, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2019: House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 3-N)
February 12, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2019: Reported from General Laws with amendment (18-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor