+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 19104420D