+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 585 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB170ER)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (85-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 11-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106727D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB170S1
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106727D-S1
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On December 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100258D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health