+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506)
On April 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 506 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB170ER)
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- Amendments by Del. Amundson agreed to
- Read third time
- Passed House with amendments (90-Y 6-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 6-N)
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 009354518-S1
- Communicated to House
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 009354518-S1
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 009354518-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Ed.
On January 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 000011518
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 7, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 6-N)
February 25, 2000: Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2000: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor