+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Continued to 2005 in Appropriations (24-Y 1-N)
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 8
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Committee substitute printed 042008820-H1
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB170S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 043137820-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 043137820-S1
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 040878820
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 2004: Continued to 2005 in Appropriations (24-Y 1-N)
February 27, 2004: Reported from C. C. T. with sub (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2004: Reported from Local Government w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor