+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 276 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB170ER)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 982795728
- Referred to Committee on Finance