+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Senate sustained Governor's veto
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Signed by President
On March 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB17ER)
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 987621701-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 987621701-H1
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (25-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 987621701-H1
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Claims with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Claims
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 985303701-E
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/30/97 985303701
- Referred to Committee on Finance