+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0141)
On March 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 141 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB169ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB169S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 084092204-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 084092204-S1
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086620204
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2008: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2008: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2008: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor