+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 688 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1679ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented and ordered printed 19103899D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 13, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2019: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2019: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2019: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor