+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator McPike agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1671E
- Printed as engrossed 19103852D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N)
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 19103852D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 5, 2019: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2019: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
January 31, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2019: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor