+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 285 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1667ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 1-N)
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 19103983D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
February 13, 2019: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
January 31, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
January 31, 2019: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor