+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 1-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105564D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Amendments by Senator Marsden agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1659ES1
- Printed as engrossed 19105564D-ES1
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19105564D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 19103696D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2019: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor