+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- No action taken by Appropriations by voice vote
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Quayle agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate-comm. substitute/w amdt.
- Printed as engrossed LD3751677 (SB165ES1)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD3751677 (SB165S1)
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (12-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 5-N)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (12-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor