+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 19104530D-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1642E
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (8-Y 7-N)
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104530D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 2019: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
January 23, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
January 23, 2019: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2019: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
January 21, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor