+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Finance (24-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985356743
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Finance (24-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor