+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0635)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 635 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1638ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1638S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105912D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19105912D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104525D
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor