+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 614 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0614)
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB163ER)
- Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB163ER)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106342D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB163S1
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106342D-S1
- Rereferred to Finance
On December 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100973D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology