+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 782 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1602ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 19106508D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106508D-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1602H1
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106508D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to19105624D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1602ES1
- Printed as engrossed 19105624D-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 19105624D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104081D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
February 21, 2019: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor