+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 303 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB16ER)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106944D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB16S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
On November 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100554D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor