+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Incorporated in other legislation (SB48-Wampler)
- No action taken by Finance (23-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 009301504-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 009301504