+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0844)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 844 (effective 7/1/19)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1581ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1581ER)
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 10-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (83-Y 10-N)
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Amended by conference committee
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Suetterlein, Vogel, Mason
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Robinson, Jones, S.C., Peace, Krizek
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1581H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19107129D-H1
- Read third time
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19107129D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103450D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (14)
April 3, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
April 3, 2019: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2019: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 10-N)
February 21, 2019: Blank Action (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2019: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2019: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
February 20, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2019: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2019: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor