+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 983088753-E
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 983088753
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 1998: Passed by indefinitely in Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor