+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 1-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (11-Y 2-N)
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101770D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2019: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 1-N)
January 29, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
January 25, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
January 23, 2019: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor