+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0598)
On April 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 598 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB157ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read third time
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed LD3494685 (SB157H1)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD3376685 (SB157S1)
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Domestic Relat. & Junven.
On January 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (6)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor