+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 673 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1564ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 17104247D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1564E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 17104247D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor