+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1563S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104773D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 17104773D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 17103296D
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 3, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor