+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0833)
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 833 (effective 7/1/02)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 2-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB156ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB156ER)
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (59-Y 37-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 37-N)
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 9-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 027328508-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 027328508
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 17, 2002: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
April 17, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
March 4, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 37-N)
February 26, 2002: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 9-N)
February 1, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2002: Reported from C. & L. with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor