+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0557)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 557 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1553ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 2-N 1-A)
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 2-N 1-A)
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Delegates: Knight, Stolle, Lindsey
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senators: Cosgrove, Stanley, Spruill
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendments
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Passed House with amendments (93-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 17103855D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
February 24, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 2-N 1-A)
February 24, 2017: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2017: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: House amendments rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
February 14, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N 1-A)
February 10, 2017: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2017: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor