+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0174)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 174 (effective 3/23/09)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1548ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources(Cox)
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 098842802
- Introduced at the request of Governor
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
February 10, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2009: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor