+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 680 (effective 7/1/19)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1547ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 4-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N 1-A)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Delegates: Bell, Robert B., Bell, Richard P., Bell, John J.
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators: Vogel, Cosgrove, Howell
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106888D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1547H1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
- Passed House with substitute (93-Y 4-N)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106888D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106234D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1547S1
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19106234D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103941D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
February 23, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N 1-A)
February 23, 2019: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2019: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2019: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
February 18, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
February 14, 2019: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
February 12, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor