+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1542ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 19106445D-S1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 7-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1542H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106445D-H1
- Read third time
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106445D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1542S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105303D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19105303D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100908D