+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- No action taken by Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #1 by Mr. Marye rejected (13-Y 27-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1 (13-Y 27-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #2 by Mr. Marye rejected
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #3 by Mr. Marye rejected (13-Y 27-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 3 (13-Y 27-N)
- Reengrossed by Senate
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 8-N)
- Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N)
On January 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 965868665