+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On February 24, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (51-Y 49-N)
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (51-Y 49-N)
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1539E
- Printed as engrossed 19100092D-E
- Passed by temporarily
- Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (10-Y 3-N)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to General Laws and Technology
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100092D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 21, 2019: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (51-Y 49-N)
February 18, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N)
February 13, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
February 5, 2019: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
February 5, 2019: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
February 4, 2019: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (10-Y 3-N)
January 22, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor