+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 115 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1529ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 19104226D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1529E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104226D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor