+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 62 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 29, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/22/16
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB152ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On December 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101837D
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2016: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2016: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor