+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 305 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1515ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
- Passed House (98-Y 2-N)
- Amendments by Delegate Griffith rejected
- Read third time
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 093969328-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1515E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 093969328
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
February 18, 2009: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2009: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor