+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 772 (effective 7/1/09)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0772)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1513ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (86-Y 9-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (86-Y 9-N)
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House insisted on amendment
- House requested conference committee
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Carrico, Wright, Bowling
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senators: Puller, Smith, Marsh
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by Senate (9-Y 28-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (84-Y 13-N)
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (84-Y 13-N)
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (18-Y 4-N)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1513S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 091458326-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 091458326-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 098765326
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
February 28, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (86-Y 9-N)
February 28, 2009: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
February 26, 2009: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2009: House amendment rejected by Senate (9-Y 28-N)
February 24, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (84-Y 13-N)
February 20, 2009: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (18-Y 4-N)
February 10, 2009: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor