+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1510S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 091676336-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 091676336-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (11-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented and ordered printed 098779336
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2009: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor