+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 613 (effective 7/1/14)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB151ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Amended by conference committee
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105071D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB151H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Edwards, Stuart, Wexton
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Bell, R.B., Gilbert, Mason
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14105071D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB151S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104045D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104045D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103142D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
March 3, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2014: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
February 26, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 3-N)
January 17, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor