+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 610 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1509ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 19106713D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1509H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106713D-H1
- Read third time
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106713D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1509S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106008D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 19106008D-S1
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101911D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 15, 2019: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2019: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor