+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0304)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 304 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1506ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1506S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 095864232-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 095864232-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 098832232
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
February 10, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2009: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor