+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- DEFEATED (28-Y 69-N 2-A)
- Defeated by House (28-Y 69-N 2-A)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 5-N)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsider passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 098750293
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2009: VOTE: --- DEFEATED (28-Y 69-N 2-A)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Rules (10-Y 5-N)
February 9, 2009: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
February 6, 2009: Reconsider passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: Passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2009: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N)
January 28, 2009: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor